Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adalbert de Boheme

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Nov 1168AppointedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
15 Mar 1169Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
9 Aug 1177RemovedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
19 Nov 1183AppointedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
8 Apr 1200DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Adalbert de Boheme
Archbishop Adalbert de Boheme (died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,231
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 307
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 432
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,786

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 24 May 2019

Quantcast