Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paris von Lodron

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1586Born
Mar 1614³28.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 161832.7SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
3 Mar 161933.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
23 May 161933.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
15 Dec 165367.8DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paris von Lodron (VIAF: 20475700)
Archbishop Paris von Lodron (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelnuovo di Noarna, Diocese of Trento, Italy
Death PlaceSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 302
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Jan 2017