Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl von Liechtenstein-Kastelkorn

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1623Born
165531.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
12 Mar 166440.9SelectedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
11 Aug 166441.4ConfirmedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
23 Sep 169572.5DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Karl von Liechtenstein-Kastelkorn
Bishop Karl von Liechtenstein-Kastelkorn (born , died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlatz

  • a priest for 40.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 264, and Page 378
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018