Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georg Eder

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Salzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1928BornMattsee
15 Jul 195628.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
21 Dec 198860.7SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
17 Jan 198960.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
26 Feb 198960.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
23 Nov 200274.7ResignedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
19 Sep 201587.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Georg Eder:
Archbishop Georg Eder (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Salzburg

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,040
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015