Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Oswald von Attems

Deceased

Bishop of Lavant


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1679BornGorizia
30 Nov 170223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
20 Feb 172445.1SelectedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
24 Feb 172445.1ConfirmedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
25 Feb 172445.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
4 May 174465.3DiedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Oswald von Attems:
Bishop Joseph Oswald von Attems (born , died ) Bishop of Lavant

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 239
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015