Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eberard von Starhemberg

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1360BornHaag
4 Feb 142767.1SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
11 Apr 142767.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
1 Jun 142767.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
9 Feb 142969.1DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Eberard von Starhemberg:
Archbishop Eberard von Starhemberg (died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,708
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 432

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013