Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andreas Rohracher

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Salzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1892BornLienz
25 May 191522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Gurk, Austria
21 Jul 193341.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gurk, Austria
21 Jul 193341.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Isba
15 Oct 193341.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isba
3 Feb 194350.6SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
1 May 194350.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
10 Oct 194351.3InstalledArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
30 Jun 196977.0RetiredArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
30 Jun 196977.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vibo
19 Nov 197078.4ResignedTitular Archbishop of Vibo
6 Aug 197684.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Andreas Rohracher:
Archbishop Andreas Rohracher (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Salzburg

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1933, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015