Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Paul (Giovanni Paolo) Ciurletti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

Titular Bishop of Byblus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1580³BornTrento
23 Jan 161736.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
23 Jan 161736.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Byblus
2 Apr 161737.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Byblus
1640¹59.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Paul (Giovanni Paolo) Ciurletti:
Bishop Johann Paul (Giovanni Paolo) Ciurletti (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 114
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015