Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Maribor

Archidioecesis Mariborensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vacant
  • Franc Kramberger, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Marjan Turnšek, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Jožef Smej, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 7 April 2006
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Slovenia
  • Square Kilometers: 7,398 (2,857 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.slomsek.net/
  • Mailing Address: Slomskov trg 19, 2000 Maribor, Slovenija
  • Telephone: (02)229.04.01
  • Fax: 252.30.92

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Lavant
10 May 1228ErectedArchdiocese of Salzburg Diocese of Lavant (erected)
Diocese of Maribor
5 March 1962Name ChangedDiocese of Lavant Diocese of Maribor
7 April 2006Territory LostDiocese of Maribor Diocese of Celje (erected)
7 April 2006Territory LostDiocese of Maribor Diocese of Murska Sobota (erected)
Archdiocese of Maribor
7 April 2006ElevatedDiocese of Maribor Archdiocese of Maribor

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Lavant
1950531,958583,88491.1%299573561,4944816225ap1951
Diocese of Maribor
1970711,925768,34392.7%2882882,471274ap1971
1980733,033827,24588.6%326944201,7452160216282ap1981
1990718,660832,50386.3%317844011,7921123170285ap1991
1999711,898839,81484.8%306873931,8113113144289ap2000
2000711,398839,81484.7%313874001,7783117134289ap2001
2001708,540843,15084.0%317874041,7533107141290ap2002
2002707,531842,45084.0%310954051,7464117139290ap2003
2003706,383841,36084.0%314944081,7314114145290ap2004
2004704,384826,22985.3%311934041,7434109134290ap2005
Archdiocese of Maribor

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Aug 2014