Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franz Lackner, O.F.M.

Archbishop of Salzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1956 BornFeldbach
16 Sep 198529.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
2 Sep 198933.1Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
23 Jun 199134.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Oct 200246.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Graz-Seckau, Austria
23 Oct 200246.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Balecium
8 Dec 200246.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Balecium
18 Nov 201357.3AppointedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
12 Jan 201457.4InstalledArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Franz Lackner:
Archbishop Franz Lackner O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of Salzburg

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Salzburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,288
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2013
  • i: CB, 19 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015