Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eduard Macheiner

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1907Born
10 Jul 193224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
1 Mar 196355.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
1 Mar 196355.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Selia
29 Jun 196355.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selia
9 Oct 196962.1SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
18 Oct 196962.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
30 Nov 196962.2InstalledArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
17 Jul 197264.9DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Eduard Macheiner (VIAF: 45111957)
Archbishop Eduard Macheiner (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFresen

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,963
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 552, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast