Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg von Oettl

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1794BornGengham
15 Sep 181723.6Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
5 Oct 184652.7SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
21 Dec 184652.9ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
7 Feb 184753.0Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
6 Feb 186672.0DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg von Oettl:
Bishop Georg von Oettl (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013