Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Friedrich von Waldenstein-Wartenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Seckau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1756Born
25 Mar 179538.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
21 Jul 180245.9SelectedBishop of Seckau, Austria
13 Aug 180245.9ConfirmedBishop of Seckau, Austria
15 Aug 180245.9Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
15 Apr 181255.6DiedBishop of Seckau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann Friedrich von Waldenstein-Wartenberg
Bishop Johann Friedrich von Waldenstein-Wartenberg (born , died ) Bishop of Seckau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien

  • a priest for 17.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 47
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018