Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Markus Sittikus von Hohenems

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1574BornHohenems
18 Mar 161237.7SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
18 Jun 161237.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
Sep 161238.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 161238.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
9 Oct 161945.2DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Markus Sittikus von Hohenems:
Archbishop Markus Sittikus von Hohenems (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 7.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 302
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015