Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Joseph von Kuenburg

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1686BornSalzburg
171326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
21 Apr 172336.9AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
6 Jun 172337.0Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
4 Oct 172337.4AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
21 May 172438.0InstalledBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
10 Dec 172943.5DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Joseph von Kuenburg:
Bishop Karl Joseph von Kuenburg (born , died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

  • a priest for 16.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013