Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eberhard von Neuhaus

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
25 May 1403SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
13 Jan 1406ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
4 Apr 1406Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
18 Jan 1427DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Eberhard von Neuhaus (VIAF: 67689941)
Archbishop Eberhard von Neuhaus (died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCelje

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 432
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,809

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast