Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigmund Christoph von Waldburg-Zeil-Trauchburg

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chiemsee, Germany

Apostolic Administrator of Salzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1754Born
19 Mar 177924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
1 Apr 179742.5AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
7 Apr 179742.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
11 Aug 180853.9ResignedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
20 May 181257.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Salzburg, Austria
7 Nov 181460.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Sigmund Christoph von Waldburg-Zeil-Trauchburg
Bishop Sigmund Christoph von Waldburg-Zeil-Trauchburg (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünchen

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 164
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast