Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felix von Stubenberg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt

Titular Bishop of Tanagra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1748³BornGraz
14 Mar 177223.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salzburg, Austria
13 Jun 177223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
11 Dec 178032.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany
11 Dec 178032.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanagra
25 Feb 178132.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanagra
18 Jun 182879.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felix von Stubenberg
Bishop Felix von Stubenberg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 47.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 357
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 391, and Page 452
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,628
  • ob/c2+: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Jun 2016