Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franz Ferdinand von Kuenburg

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1651³BornMossa
30 Jan 168937.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salzburg, Austria
9 Apr 168938.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
18 Jul 170150.4AppointedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
31 Jul 170150.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
2 Apr 171160.1SelectedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
11 May 171160.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
7 Aug 173180.5DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Ferdinand von Kuenburg:
Archbishop Franz Ferdinand von Kuenburg (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 233, and Page 323
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015