Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Balthasar Schitter

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

Titular Bishop of Dulma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1793BornLintsching
11 Jun 181623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
20 May 185057.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
20 May 185057.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dulma
28 Jul 185057.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dulma
19 Oct 186875.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Balthasar Schitter:
Bishop Balthasar Schitter (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013