Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Adam Arco

Deceased

Bishop of Seckau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1733BornSalzburg
11 Nov 175522.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salzburg, Austria
7 Dec 175522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
9 Apr 176431.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
9 Apr 176431.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
1 May 176431.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
22 Oct 177340.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
17 May 177643.3SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
15 Jul 177643.4ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
25 Aug 177643.5InstalledBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
1 Jan 178046.9SelectedBishop of Seckau, Austria
14 Mar 178047.1ResignedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
6 Apr 178047.1ConfirmedBishop of Seckau, Austria
178349.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Seckau, Austria
3 Jun 180269.3DiedBishop of Seckau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Joseph Adam Arco: VIAF:20024172
Archbishop Joseph Adam Arco (born , died ) Bishop of Seckau

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 237, and Page 356
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 371, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015