Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Maximilian von Thun und Hohenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1681³BornCaldeti
1705²23.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
30 Aug 170928.1AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
29 Sep 170928.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
26 Jul 174160.0DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jakob Maximilian von Thun und Hohenstein:
Bishop Jakob Maximilian von Thun und Hohenstein (born , died ) Bishop of Gurk

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015