Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Innsbruck

Dioecesis Oenipontanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Manfred Scheuer, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 8 December 1968
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Salzburg
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Austria
  • Square Kilometers: 9,845 (3,802 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioezese-innsbruck.at/
  • Mailing Address: Bischofliches Ordinariat, Riedgasse 9-11, A-6020 Innsbruck, Oesterreich
  • Telephone: (0512)2230-2101
  • Fax: 2230-2199

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Administration of Innsbruck-Feldkirch
11 December 1925ErectedApostolic Administration of Innsbruck-Feldkirch (erected)
Diocese of Innsbruck-Feldkirch
6 August 1964ElevatedApostolic Administration of Innsbruck-Feldkirch Diocese of Innsbruck-Feldkirch
8 December 1968SplitDiocese of Innsbruck-Feldkirch Diocese of Feldkirch
Diocese of Innsbruck
Diocese of Innsbruck
8 December 1968SplitDiocese of Innsbruck-Feldkirch Diocese of Feldkirch
Diocese of Innsbruck

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Apostolic Administration of Innsbruck-Feldkirch
1950481,156520,00092.5%6053951,0004815922,339394ap1951
Diocese of Innsbruck-Feldkirch
Diocese of Innsbruck
1970381,000407,00093.6%2312885197343731,488239ap1971
1980421,500451,40093.4%295245540780103001,250276ap1981
1990466,686505,05892.4%2372004371,06721242920285ap1991
1999418,011499,62283.7%20327347687844354371242ap2000
2000429,182464,23692.4%20127347490544354371242ap2001
2001434,820460,80194.4%1872123991,08944277194245ap2002
2002412,871462,32389.3%1862103961,04254277193245ap2003
2003410,837463,66688.6%20320941299754280285244ap2004
2004408,895467,17087.5%1721953671,114257257244ap2005
2006407,982526,22677.5%2091873961,03054258253244ap2007
2012395,855537,77073.6%1891673561,11160290237244ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013