Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rupert Mayr

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria

Titular Bishop of Paneade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1810Born
27 Jul 183423.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salzburg, Austria
1 Aug 183423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
22 Oct 186959.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
22 Oct 186959.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Paneade
14 Nov 186959.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paneade
27 Jul 187362.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Rupert Mayr (VIAF: 232332635)
Bishop Rupert Mayr (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruck an der Grossglocknerstrasse, Pinzgau, Archdiocese of Salzburg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 437
  • c3: CB, 26 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,194
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast