Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cardinal Electors


(Click on the column title to sort by that column)
BirthdateAgeElevatedNameCurrent Title
8 Sep 1945 26 Nov 1994Vinko Cardinal PuljićArchbishop Emeritus of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
5 Aug 1944 21 Feb 1998Polycarp Cardinal PengoArchbishop Emeritus of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
22 Jan 1945 21 Feb 1998Christoph Cardinal Schönborn, O.P.Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
17 Oct 1950 21 Oct 2003Philippe Xavier Christian Ignace Marie Cardinal BarbarinArchbishop Emeritus of Lyon, France
20 Mar 1949 21 Oct 2003Josip Cardinal BozanićArchbishop Emeritus of Zagreb, Croatia
25 Jun 1952 21 Oct 2003Péter Cardinal ErdőArchbishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
8 Jun 1944 21 Oct 2003Marc Armand Cardinal Ouellet, P.S.S.Prefect Emeritus of the Dicastery for Bishops
11 Oct 1948 21 Oct 2003Peter Kodwo Appiah Cardinal TurksonChancellor of the Roman Curia - Other
15 Oct 1945 24 Mar 2006Antonio Cardinal Cañizares LloveraArchbishop Emeritus of Valencia, Spain
29 Jun 1944 24 Mar 2006Seán Patrick Cardinal O’Malley, O.F.M. Cap.Archbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
26 Sep 1944 24 Mar 2006Jean-Pierre Bernard Cardinal RicardArchbishop Emeritus of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
23 May 1949 24 Nov 2007Daniel Nicholas Cardinal DiNardoArchbishop of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
24 Dec 1944 24 Nov 2007Oswald Cardinal GraciasArchbishop of Bombay, India
1944 24 Nov 2007John Cardinal NjueArchbishop Emeritus of Nairobi, Kenya
2 Mar 1949 24 Nov 2007José Francisco Cardinal Robles OrtegaArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
4 Jul 1945 24 Nov 2007Stanisław Cardinal RyłkoArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
21 Sep 1949 24 Nov 2007Odilo Pedro Cardinal SchererArchbishop of São Paulo, Brazil
30 Jun 1948 20 Nov 2010Raymond Leo Cardinal BurkePrefect Emeritus of the Apostolic Signatura
15 Mar 1950 20 Nov 2010Kurt Cardinal KochPrefect of the Dicastery for Promoting Christian Unity
21 Sep 1953 20 Nov 2010Reinhard Cardinal MarxArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
1 Feb 1950 20 Nov 2010Kazimierz Cardinal NyczArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
15 Sep 1944 20 Nov 2010Mauro Cardinal PiacenzaMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
15 Nov 1947 20 Nov 2010Albert Malcolm Ranjith Cardinal Patabendige DonArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
15 Jun 1945 20 Nov 2010Robert Cardinal SarahPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
19 Apr 1945 18 Feb 2012George Cardinal AlencherryMajor Archbishop Emeritus of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar), India
25 Feb 1947 18 Feb 2012Giuseppe Cardinal BetoriArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
24 Apr 1947 18 Feb 2012João Cardinal Bráz de AvizPrefect of the Dicastery for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
16 Jan 1947 18 Feb 2012Thomas Christopher Cardinal CollinsArchbishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
6 Feb 1950 18 Feb 2012Timothy Michael Cardinal DolanArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
22 Jun 1953 18 Feb 2012Willem Jacobus Cardinal EijkArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
15 Apr 1946 18 Feb 2012Fernando Cardinal FiloniGrand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
18 Aug 1956 18 Feb 2012Rainer Maria Cardinal WoelkiArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
20 Oct 1949 24 Nov 2012James Michael Cardinal HarveyArchpriest of the Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}
21 Jun 1957 24 Nov 2012Luis Antonio Gokim Cardinal TaglePro-Prefect of the Dicastery for Evangelization
15 Jun 1959 24 Nov 2012Baselios Cleemis (Isaac) Cardinal ThottunkalMajor Archbishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
7 Mar 1949 22 Feb 2014Leopoldo José Cardinal Brenes SolórzanoArchbishop of Managua, Nicaragua
22 Dec 1945 22 Feb 2014Jean-Pierre Cardinal KutwaArchbishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
27 Jul 1957 22 Feb 2014Gérald Cyprien Cardinal Lacroix, I.S.P.X.Archbishop of Québec, Canada
29 Nov 1958 22 Feb 2014Chibly Cardinal LangloisBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
31 Dec 1947 22 Feb 2014Gerhard Ludwig Cardinal MüllerPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
8 Nov 1945 22 Feb 2014Vincent Gerard Cardinal NicholsArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
25 Jan 1945 22 Feb 2014Philippe Nakellentuba Cardinal OuédraogoArchbishop Emeritus of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
17 Jan 1955 22 Feb 2014Pietro Cardinal ParolinSecretary of State
29 Nov 1947 22 Feb 2014Mario Aurelio Cardinal PoliArchbishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires, Argentina
23 Jun 1950 22 Feb 2014Orani João Cardinal Tempesta, O. Cist.Archbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
29 Oct 1948 14 Feb 2015Charles Maung Cardinal Bo, S.D.B.Archbishop of Yangon, Myanmar
5 May 1948 14 Feb 2015John Atcherley Cardinal DewArchbishop Emeritus of Wellington, New Zealand
15 Nov 1949 14 Feb 2015Arlindo Cardinal Gomes FurtadoBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
27 Jun 1949 14 Feb 2015Francis Xavier Kriengsak Cardinal KovithavanijArchbishop of Bangkok, Thailand
16 Jul 1948 14 Feb 2015Manuel José Cardinal Macário do Nascimento ClementePatriarch Emeritus of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
19 Dec 1961 14 Feb 2015Soane Patita Paini Cardinal MafiBishop of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
7 Mar 1952 14 Feb 2015Dominique François Joseph Cardinal MambertiPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
22 May 1946 14 Feb 2015Francesco Cardinal MontenegroArchbishop Emeritus of Agrigento, Italy
14 Jul 1948 14 Feb 2015Berhaneyesus Demerew Cardinal Souraphiel, C.M.Archbishop of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
4 Jul 1959 14 Feb 2015Daniel Fernando Cardinal Sturla Berhouet, S.D.B.Archbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
9 Jan 1950 19 Nov 2016Carlos Cardinal Aguiar RetesArchbishop of México, Federal District
19 Mar 1949 19 Nov 2016Blase Joseph Cardinal CupichArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
21 Oct 1959 19 Nov 2016Sérgio Cardinal da RochaArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
17 Jun 1947 19 Nov 2016Jozef Cardinal De KeselArchbishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
2 Sep 1947 19 Nov 2016Kevin Joseph Cardinal FarrellPrefect of the Dicastery for the Laity, the Family and Life
14 Mar 1967 19 Nov 2016Dieudonné Cardinal Nzapalainga, C.S.Sp.Archbishop of Bangui, Central African Republic
16 May 1945 19 Nov 2016Carlos Cardinal Osoro SierraArchbishop Emeritus of Madrid, Spain
10 Oct 1944 19 Nov 2016Baltazar Enrique Cardinal Porras CardozoArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
9 Feb 1957 19 Nov 2016John Cardinal Ribat, M.S.C.Archbishop of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea
3 May 1952 19 Nov 2016Joseph William Cardinal Tobin, C.SS.R.Archbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
5 Jan 1946 19 Nov 2016Mario Cardinal ZenariApostolic Nuncio to Syria
24 Sep 1949 28 Jun 2017Anders Cardinal Arborelius, O.C.D.Bishop of Stockholm, Sweden
8 Apr 1944 28 Jun 2017Louis-Marie Ling Cardinal Mangkhanekhoun, I.V.D.Vicar Apostolic of Vientiane, Laos
21 Apr 1946 28 Jun 2017Juan José Cardinal Omella OmellaArchbishop of Barcelona, Spain
21 Jul 1945 28 Jun 2018Joseph Cardinal CouttsArchbishop Emeritus of Karachi, Pakistan
4 Jan 1954 28 Jun 2018Angelo Cardinal De DonatisVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy
5 May 1947 28 Jun 2018António Augusto Cardinal dos Santos MartoBishop Emeritus of Leiria-Fátima, Portugal
25 Nov 1963 28 Jun 2018Konrad Cardinal KrajewskiPrefect of the Dicastery for the Service of Charity
19 Apr 1944 28 Jun 2018Luis Francisco Cardinal Ladaria Ferrer, S.J.Prefect Emeritus of the Dicastery for the Doctrine of the Faith
3 Mar 1949 28 Jun 2018Thomas Aquino Manyo Cardinal MaedaArchbishop of Osaka-Takamatsu, Japan
19 Aug 1948 28 Jun 2018Giuseppe Cardinal PetrocchiArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
4 Jul 1949 28 Jun 2018Louis Raphaël I Cardinal SakoPatriarch of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq
13 Jun 1954 28 Jun 2018Désiré Cardinal TsarahazanaArchbishop of Toamasina, Madagascar
17 Jun 1952 5 Oct 2019Miguel Ángel Cardinal Ayuso Guixot, M.C.C.I.Prefect of the Dicastery for Interreligious Dialogue
24 Jan 1960 5 Oct 2019Fridolin Cardinal Ambongo Besungu, O.F.M. Cap.Archbishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Jul 1946 5 Oct 2019Michael F. Cardinal Czerny, S.J.Prefect of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development
11 Jul 1948 5 Oct 2019Juan de la Caridad Cardinal García RodríguezArchbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
9 Aug 1958 5 Oct 2019Jean-Claude Cardinal Hollerich, S.J.Archbishop of Luxembourg
19 May 1952 5 Oct 2019Cristóbal Cardinal López Romero, S.D.B.Archbishop of Rabat, Morocco
15 Dec 1965 5 Oct 2019José Tolentino Cardinal Calaça de MendonçaPrefect of the Dicastery for Culture and Education
16 Jul 1947 5 Oct 2019Alvaro Leonel Cardinal Ramazzini ImeriBishop of Huehuetenango, Guatemala
9 Jul 1950 5 Oct 2019Ignatius Cardinal Suharyo HardjoatmodjoArchbishop of Jakarta, Indonesia
11 Oct 1955 5 Oct 2019Matteo Maria Cardinal ZuppiArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
30 Mar 1952 28 Nov 2020Jose Fuerte Cardinal AdvinculaArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
6 Apr 1945 28 Nov 2020Celestino Cardinal Aós Braco, O.F.M. Cap.Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile
27 Oct 1965 28 Nov 2020Mauro Maria Cardinal Gambetti, O.F.M. Conv.President of the Fabric of St. Peter
20 Feb 1957 28 Nov 2020Mario Cardinal GrechSecretary General of the Synod of Bishops
7 Dec 1947 28 Nov 2020Wilton Daniel Cardinal GregoryArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
10 Nov 1958 28 Nov 2020Antoine Cardinal KambandaArchbishop of Kigali, Rwanda
1 Jul 1964 28 Nov 2020Augusto Paolo Cardinal LojudiceArchbishop of Siena-Colle di Val d’Elsa-Montalcino, Italy
22 Dec 1947 28 Nov 2020Marcello Cardinal SemeraroPrefect of the Dicastery for the Causes of Saints
26 Dec 1958 27 Aug 2022Jean-Marc Noël Cardinal AvelineArchbishop of Marseille, France
1 Sep 1950 27 Aug 2022Oscar Cardinal CantoniBishop of Como, Italy
20 Jul 1967 27 Aug 2022Paulo Cezar Cardinal CostaArchbishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
27 Nov 1967 27 Aug 2022Virgilio Cardinal do Carmo da Silva, S.D.B.Archbishop of Díli, Timor-Leste
25 Jun 1957 27 Aug 2022William Cardinal Goh Seng ChyeArchbishop of Singapore
7 Jun 1974 27 Aug 2022Giorgio Cardinal Marengo, I.M.C.Prefect of Ulaanbaatar, Mongolia
8 Jul 1951 27 Aug 2022Adalberto Cardinal Martínez FloresArchbishop of Asunción, Paraguay
5 Feb 1954 27 Aug 2022Robert Walter Cardinal McElroyBishop of San Diego, California, USA
1 Mar 1963 27 Aug 2022Peter Ebere Cardinal OkpalekeBishop of Ekwulobia, Nigeria
15 Nov 1961 27 Aug 2022Anthony Cardinal PoolaArchbishop of Hyderabad, India
6 Mar 1950 27 Aug 2022Arthur Cardinal RochePrefect of the Dicastery for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
20 Jan 1953 27 Aug 2022Filipe Neri António Sebastião do Rosário Cardinal FerrãoArchbishop of Goa e Damão, India
6 Nov 1950 27 Aug 2022Leonardo Ulrich Cardinal Steiner, O.F.M.Archbishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
1 Mar 1945 27 Aug 2022Fernando Cardinal Vérgez Alzaga, L.C.President of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
17 Nov 1951 27 Aug 2022Lazzaro Cardinal You Heung-sikPrefect of the Dicastery for the Clergy
12 Dec 1973 30 Sep 2023Américo Manuel Cardinal Alves AguiarBishop of Setúbal, Portugal
10 Jan 1964 30 Sep 2023Stephen Ameyu Martin Cardinal MullaArchbishop of Juba, South Sudan
24 Sep 1956 30 Sep 2023Stephen Cardinal BrislinArchbishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
23 Nov 1968 30 Sep 2023François-Xavier Cardinal Bustillo, O.F.M. Conv.Bishop of Ajaccio, France
7 Aug 1959 30 Sep 2023Stephen Cardinal Chow Sau-yan, S.J.Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
20 Sep 1965 30 Sep 2023José Cardinal Cobo CanoArchbishop of Madrid, Spain
21 Aug 1960 30 Sep 2023Ángel Cardinal Fernández Artime, S.D.B.Rector General of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
18 Jul 1962 30 Sep 2023Victor Manuel Cardinal FernándezPrefect of the Dicastery for the Doctrine of the Faith
11 Nov 1951 30 Sep 2023Sebastian Cardinal FrancisBishop of Penang, Malaysia
7 Oct 1955 30 Sep 2023Claudio Cardinal GugerottiPrefect of the Dicastery for the Eastern Churches
30 Jan 1946 30 Sep 2023Christophe Louis Yves Georges Cardinal PierreApostolic Nuncio to United States of America
21 Apr 1965 30 Sep 2023Pierbattista Cardinal Pizzaballa, O.F.M.Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
14 Sep 1955 30 Sep 2023Robert Francis Cardinal Prevost, O.S.A.Prefect of the Dicastery for Bishops
11 Aug 1958 30 Sep 2023Ángel Sixto Cardinal Rossi, S.J.Archbishop of Córdoba, Argentina
3 Mar 1962 30 Sep 2023Luis José Cardinal Rueda AparicioArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
31 May 1960 30 Sep 2023Protase Cardinal RugambwaArchbishop of Tabora, Tanzania
9 Feb 1964 30 Sep 2023Grzegorz Wojciech Cardinal RyśArchbishop of Łódź, Poland
3 Feb 1947 30 Sep 2023Emil Paul Cardinal TscherrigApostolic Nuncio to Italy
Note: Cardinals that reach the age of 80 before the day the Holy See becomes vacant may not vote in a conclave.
129 Cardinal Electors of 239 living Cardinals. This table was last updated on 3 Mar 2024.

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 3 Mar 2024