Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Díli

Archidioecesis Diliensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Virgilio do Carmo da Silva, S.D.B., Archbishop
  • Carlos Filipe Ximenes Belo, S.D.B., Apostolic Administrator Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 September 2019
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Timor-Leste
  • Square Kilometers: 4,775 (1,844 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Camara Eclesiaastica, Av. Direitos Humanos, P.O. Box 50, Bidau Lecidere, Dili 88010, Timor Leste
  • Telephone: 332.48.50
  • Fax: 332.23.93

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Díli
4 September 1940ErectedDiocese of Macau Diocese of Díli (erected)
30 November 1996Territory LostDiocese of Díli Diocese of Baucau (erected)
30 January 2010Territory LostDiocese of Díli Diocese of Maliana (erected)
Archdiocese of Díli
11 September 2019ElevatedDiocese of Díli Archdiocese of Díli

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Díli
194938,034420,4309.0%195241,584122311ap1951
1970164,178618,53026.5%3610463,56917463ap1971
1980213,000740,80028.8%187258,520113618ap1981
1990583,079714,24581.6%2439639,25517410024ap1991
1998527,294627,16684.1%3848866,13115225422ap2001
2001504,299539,81193.4%2638647,87913920322ap2002
2002514,089558,61092.0%3246786,59014920328ap2004
2006663,331789,70184.0%47761235,39211827930ap2007
2010435,052464,64993.6%56481044,1836916225bul30Jan2010
2013561,135591,42594.9%57711284,3839033128ap2014
2016585,958617,89894.8%57921493,93211453228ap2017
Archdiocese of Díli
2019641,715677,50094.7%67901574,087119345532ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast