Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bangui

Archidioecesis Banguensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Dieudonné Nzapalainga, C.S.Sp., Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Paulin Pomodimo, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Central African Republic
  • Square Kilometers: 38,342 (14,809 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: https://archidiocesedebangui.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, Bd. Charles de Gaulle, Mission St. Paul, B.P. 798, Bangui, Rep. Centrafricaine
  • Telephone: 75.44.59.75

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Oubangui Chari
8 May 1909ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Upper French Congo {Congo Francese Superiore} o Ubanghi Prefecture Apostolic of Oubangui Chari (erected)
8 February 1929Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Brazzaville (Haute Sangha) Prefecture Apostolic of Oubangui Chari
Vicariate Apostolic of Oubangui Chari
2 December 1937ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Oubangui Chari Vicariate Apostolic of Oubangui Chari
13 December 1938Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Lisala (Boundaries Adjusted)
Vicariate Apostolic of Oubangui Chari (Boundaries Adjusted)
28 May 1940Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Oubangui Chari (Southern part) Vicariate Apostolic of Brazzaville
28 May 1940Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Vicariate Apostolic of Oubangui Chari
Prefecture Apostolic of Berbérati (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bangui
28 May 1940Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Oubangui Chari Vicariate Apostolic of Bangui
9 January 1947Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Khartoum (Region between Chad, 10th latitude, and Sudan) Vicariate Apostolic of Bangui
14 June 1954Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bangui (Basse-Kotto and Mbomou, and Mobaye, Alindao, Kembe, Bangassou, Ouango, Bakouma, Rafay, Zemio, and Obo.) Prefecture Apostolic of Bangassou (erected)
Archdiocese of Bangui
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bangui Archdiocese of Bangui
18 December 1965Territory LostArchdiocese of Bangui Diocese of Bambari (erected)
10 June 1995Territory LostArchdiocese of Bangui (Mbaiki) Diocese of Mbaïki (erected)
28 June 1997Territory LostArchdiocese of Bangui (Ibingui-Economique, Bamingui-Bangoran, and Gribingui-Economique) Diocese of Kaga-Bandoro (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bangui
195035,000665,0005.3%242447955028463ap1951
Archdiocese of Bangui
195979,748480,00016.6%453571,3996685ap1960
1969131,805650,00020.3%1561761,7348214330ap1971
1978161,662708,97822.8%1150612,6506910629ap1981
1990240,317769,00031.3%1850683,5341749632ap1991
1999203,322809,71325.1%2739663,0806112522ap2000
2000208,438829,95525.1%2838663,1585614425ap2001
2001214,858850,70325.3%3238703,0695511925ap2002
2002214,858871,97024.6%3535703,0695211925ap2003
2003166,135893,97018.6%4228702,3734512525ap2004
2004201,131916,46221.9%4034742,7174510425ap2005
2006224,071964,10523.2%4234762,9484610825ap2007
2012487,0001,083,00045.0%3252845,7976611025ap2013
2015515,0001,218,00042.3%35841194,32711915425ap2016
2018544,9351,312,00041.5%40721124,86511515926ap2019
2020657,0001,584,20041.5%34781125,86613016033ap2021
2022680,0001,640,00041.5%42721145,96410718333ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Prefecture Apostolic of Oubangui Chari
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 21, Page 553, and Page 554
  • Vicariate Apostolic of Oubangui Chari
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 30, Page 189, and Page 190
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 31, Page 170, and Page 171
  • Vicariate Apostolic of Bangui
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 32, Page 504
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 39, Page 229
  • Archdiocese of Bangui
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 48, Page 113, to Page 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 19 Feb 2024