Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dicastery for the Causes of Saints

Dicasterium de Causis Sanctorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Marcello Semeraro, Cardinal, Prefect
  • Fabio Fabene, Secretary
  • Bogusław Stanisław Turek, C.S.M.A., Under Secretary
  • Melchor Sánchez de Toca y Alameda, Official
  • Angelo Amato, S.D.B., Cardinal, Prefect Emeritus
  • Giovanni Angelo Becciu, Cardinal, Prefect Emeritus
  • José Saraiva Martins, C.M.F., Cardinal, Prefect Emeritus
  • Marcello Bartolucci, Secretary Emeritus
  • Michele Di Ruberto, Secretary Emeritus
  • Edward Nowak, Secretary Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Dicastery
  • Elevated: 5 June 2022
  • Curial Office
  • Roman Curia
  • Description: Treats all that pertains to causes of beatification and canonization (Praedicate Evangelium, 98)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
22 January 1588EstablishedCongregation of (Sacred) Rites
28 January 1904Territory AddedCongregation for Indulgences and Relics (suppressed) Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
29 June 1908EstablishedCongregation of (Sacred) Rites Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
Congregation for the Causes of Saints
1969Name ChangedCongregation of (Sacred) Rites Congregation for the Causes of Saints
Dicastery for the Causes of Saints
5 June 2022ElevatedCongregation for the Causes of Saints Dicastery for the Causes of Saints

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 13 Dec 2023