Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mario Cardinal Grech

Secretary General of the Synod of Bishops

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1957 Born
26 May 198427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Gozo, Malta
26 Nov 200548.7AppointedBishop of Gozo, Malta
22 Jan 200648.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gozo, Malta
2 Oct 201962.6AppointedPro-Secretary General of the Synod of Bishops
2 Oct 201962.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gozo, Malta
21 Aug 202063.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Gozo, Malta
15 Sep 202063.5AppointedSecretary General of the Synod of Bishops
28 Nov 202063.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 Nov 202063.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

MicroData Summary for Mario Grech (VIAF: 5750149489163793810006)
Mario Cardinal Grech (born ) Secretary General of Synod of Bishops

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQala
Ordained PriestAssumption, Cathedral, Victoria, Diocese of Gozo, Malta
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Victoria, Diocese of Gozo, Malta

Please contact the Cardinal through the Synod of Bishops.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,043
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Oct 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Sep 2020
  • card: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2020
  • cdea: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Apr 2021

Quantcast