Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Luxembourg

Archidioecesis Luxemburgensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jean-Claude Hollerich, S.J., Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Léon Wagener, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Fernand Franck, Archbishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 23 April 1988
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Luxembourg
  • Square Kilometers: 2,586 (998 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.cathol.lu/
  • Mailing Address: Archevêché, B.P. 419, 4 rue Genistre, L-2014 Luxembourg
  • Telephone: 46.20.23
  • Fax: 47.53.81

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Luxembourg
2 June 1840ErectedDiocese of Namur {Namen} Vicariate Apostolic of Luxembourg (erected)
Diocese of Luxembourg
27 September 1870ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Luxembourg Diocese of Luxembourg
4 August 1937Territory LostDiocese of Luxembourg Territorial Abbey of Saint-Maurice et Saint-Maur de Clervaux {Santi Maurizio e Mauro di Clervaux} (erected)
Archdiocese of Luxembourg
23 April 1988ElevatedDiocese of Luxembourg Archdiocese of Luxembourg

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Luxembourg
1950289,500291,00099.5%5011006014812201,800267ap1951
1969315,475335,11394.1%437875246021351,708240ap1971
1980344,100362,21195.0%359984577521321,251274ap1981
Archdiocese of Luxembourg
1990356,155374,90095.0%269833521,0112109964274ap1991
1999372,800423,70088.0%205812861,303799706275ap2000
2000377,700429,20088.0%206772831,33492686275ap2001
2001378,000435,70086.8%207722791,354785650275ap2002
2002380,000441,30086.1%196722681,417785619275ap2003
2003382,000441,30086.6%187682551,498781595275ap2004
2004388,000448,30086.5%180682481,564780566275ap2005
2013411,000537,00076.5%148572052,004668371275ap2014
2016425,000576,00073.8%133531862,284867343275ap2017
2019439,280602,00573.0%123551782,4671570297275ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast