Catholic-Hierarchy DC

聲gel Cardinal Fern嫕dez Artime, S.D.B.

Rector General of Salesians of Saint John Bosco

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Auxiliatrice in via Tuscolana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1960 Born
3 Sep 197818.0First VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
17 Jun 198423.8Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
4 Jul 198726.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 Mar 201453.5ElectedRector General of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
30 Sep 202363.1Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 202363.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Auxiliatrice in via Tuscolana
17 Dec 202363.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Auxiliatrice in via Tuscolana
31 Jul 202463.9CeasedRector General of Salesians of Saint John Bosco

MicroData Summary for 聲gel Fern嫕dez Artime
(VIAF: 315524152; WikiData: Q15978622)
聲gel Cardinal Fern嫕dez Artime S.D.B. (born ) Rector General of Salesians of Saint John Bosco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGoz鏮-Luanco (Asturie), Spain
Ordained PriestLe鏮, Diocese of Le鏮, Spain

Please contact the Cardinal through the Salesians of Saint John Bosco.

  • a priest for years
  • a cardinal for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2023
  • ceas: CB, 15 Jul 2023
  • cdea: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2023
  • i: Bollettino, 11 Dec 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024