Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tonga

Dioecesis Tongana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Soane Patita Paini Mafi, Cardinal, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 21 June 1966
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Tonga
  • Region: Pacific (Oceania)
  • Square Kilometers: 947 (365 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Toutaimana Catholic Centre, P.O. Box 1, Nuku'alofa, Tonga
  • Telephone: 23-822/3
  • Fax: 23-854

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Oceania
23 August 1842ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Western Oceania Vicariate Apostolic of Central Oceania (erected)
23 July 1847Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Central Oceania Vicariate Apostolic of Nouvelle-Calédonie (erected)
20 August 1850Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Central Oceania Vicariate Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori} (erected)
27 March 1863Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Central Oceania Prefecture Apostolic of Fiji Island (erected)
11 November 1935Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Central Oceania Vicariate Apostolic of Wallis et Futuna (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tonga Islands {Isole Tonga}
13 April 1937Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Central Oceania Vicariate Apostolic of Tonga Islands {Isole Tonga}
Vicariate Apostolic of Tonga Islands {Isole Tonga} e Niue
22 March 1957Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Tonga Islands {Isole Tonga} Vicariate Apostolic of Tonga Islands {Isole Tonga} e Niue
Diocese of Tonga
21 June 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Tonga Islands {Isole Tonga} e Niue Diocese of Tonga

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Tonga Islands {Isole Tonga}
19506,38832,00020.0%3912532938ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Tonga Islands {Isole Tonga} e Niue
Diocese of Tonga
197014,48892,80015.6%62127536248213ap1971
198014,93690,07216.6%91625597323913ap1981
199012,63792,36513.7%14923549335113ap1991
199915,53997,44615.9%10919817204813ap2000
200015,53997,44615.9%10919817255113ap2001
200115,33997,44615.7%13922697274313ap2002
200215,79997,92616.1%131023686264411ap2003
200315,76797,89416.1%14822716284013ap2004
200415,76797,89416.1%18927583264713ap2005
201013,367103,39112.9%29938351154114ap2011
201414,332103,39113.9%191231462203914ap2015
201714,691103,39814.2%17926565154714ap2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 12 Apr 2021

Quantcast