Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Juba

Archidioecesis Iubaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 12 December 1974
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Sudan
  • Square Kilometers: 25,137 (9,709 Square Miles)
  • Description: Central Equatoria State
  • Official Web Site: https://archdioceseofjuba.org
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Church, P.O. Box 32, Juba, Equatoria Province, Sud Sudan
  • Telephone: 954.117.111

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel
14 July 1927ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Nilo Equatoriale Prefecture Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel (erected)
10 January 1933Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel
Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Kodok (erected) (Province of Upper Nile)
3 March 1949Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel (Morii)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal (Zande)
Prefecture Apostolic of Mupoi (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel
12 April 1951ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel
3 July 1955Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel (Yei)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal (Lakes)
Prefecture Apostolic of Mupoi (Moru)
Vicariate Apostolic of Rumbek (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Juba
26 May 1961Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel Vicariate Apostolic of Juba
12 January 1973Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Rumbek (Yei District (Equatoria Province)) Vicariate Apostolic of Juba
Archdiocese of Juba
12 December 1974ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Juba Archdiocese of Juba
2 May 1983Territory LostArchdiocese of Juba (Torit and Kapoeta) Diocese of Torit (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel
195035,708343,20010.4%330331,08252319ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel
Vicariate Apostolic of Juba
1966215,850500,00043.2%6635,975113619ap1971
Archdiocese of Juba
1980283,861834,00034.0%11102113,517202515ap1981
1990228,112617,64436.9%1035455,069615010ap1991
1999425,384726,64058.5%1912021,26914187ap2000
2000429,452728,18859.0%1811922,60214269ap2001
2001433,454733,65959.1%2012120,64017229ap2002
2002438,333738,82559.3%3023213,697192210ap2003
2003443,371472,66093.8%323213,855182510ap2004
2004450,348748,77560.1%313114,527182510ap2005
2006459,703754,06861.0%383812,097172211ap2007
2012725,814921,28578.8%40185812,514324412ap2013
2013745,000945,00078.8%42186012,416324412ap2014
2016760,000985,00077.2%47156212,258267815ap2017
2019806,0001,045,00077.1%48267410,891417116ap2020
2021849,0001,101,75077.1%47267311,630417116ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 43, Page 583, and Page 584
  • Vicariate Apostolic of Juba
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 65, Page 105, and Page 106
  • Archdiocese of Juba
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 67, Page 164, and Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 1 Dec 2023