Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia

Archidioecesis Sancti Salvatoris in Brasilia



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 16 November 1676
  • Metropolitan See
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Bahia
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 1,320 (509 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste 3
  • Official Web Site: https://arquidiocesesalvador.org.br
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, Av. Leovigildo Filgueiras 270, Garcia, 40100-000 Salvador, BA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (071)4009-6666; 4009-6605

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of São Salvador da Bahia de Todos os Santos
25 February 1551ErectedArchdiocese of Funchal Diocese of São Salvador da Bahia de Todos os Santos (erected)
3 July 1551Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of São Salvador da Bahia de Todos os Santos (from Funchal to Lisboa)
19 July 1575Territory LostDiocese of São Salvador da Bahia de Todos os Santos Territorial Prelature of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro (erected)
15 July 1614Territory LostDiocese of São Salvador da Bahia de Todos os Santos Territorial Prelature of Pernambuco (erected)
Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia
16 November 1676ElevatedDiocese of São Salvador da Bahia de Todos os Santos Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia
3 January 1910Territory LostArchdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia Diocese of Aracajú (erected)
20 October 1913Territory LostArchdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia Diocese of Barra (do Rio Grande) (erected)
Diocese of Caetité (erected)
Diocese of Ilhéus (erected)
6 April 1933Territory LostArchdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia (Bomfim, Abaré, Bom Consélho, Campo Formoso, Cumbe, Capim Grosso, Coneeiçâo do Coite, Geremoabo, Itiuba, Jacobina, Morro de Chapeo, Monte Santo, Queimadas, Biachâo de Jacobina, Biachâo de JJtinga, Sande, S. Antonio da Gloria, Bombai, Tucano, and Vana) Diocese of Bonfim (erected)
10 May 1941Territory LostArchdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia (Amargosa, Afonso Penna, Aratuhype, Areia, Brejoês, Castro Alves, Itaquara, Itirussu, Jaguaquara, Jaguaripe, Jequiricù, Lage, Maracas, Mutuhype, Santo Antônio de Jesus, Santa Inês, São Miguel, Santa Terezinha, Boa, Nova, Conquista, Encruzilhada, Itambé...) Diocese of Amargosa (erected)
14 November 1959Territory LostDiocese of Amargosa (Parts of Andaraí)
Diocese of Barra (do Rio Grande) (Seabra)
Diocese of Bonfim (Ireoê, Miguel Calmon, Morro do Chapéu, and Utinga)
Diocese of Caetité (Lencóis, Palmeiras, and parts of Andaraí)
Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia (Baixa Grande, Ipirá, Ibiquera, Itaberaba, Macajuba, Mairi, Mundo Novo, Piritiba, and Rui Barbosa)
Diocese of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa) (erected)
21 July 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia (Feira de Santana, Santaluz, Conceiçâo do Coite, Serrinha, Riachäo do Jacuîpe, Irara, Coraçâo de Maria, Sâo Gonçalo dos Campos, Conceiçâ da Feira, Serra Prêta, Santo Estêvâo, Tanquinho , Valente, Aracus, Conceiçâo do Jacuípe, and Amelia Rodríguez) Diocese of Feira de Santana (erected)
28 October 1974Territory LostArchdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia (Alagoinhas, Catú, Mata de S. Joâo, Inhambupe, Ribeira do Amparo, Entre Rios, Nova Soure, Conde, Itapicuru, Esplanada, Rio Real, Olindina, Aporá, Po juca, Crisópolis , Satiro Dias, Teodoro Sampaio, Acajutiba, Aramari, Jandaira, Cipo, Itanagra, ...) Diocese of Alagoinhas (erected)
7 November 1978Territory LostDiocese of Ilhéus (Cairú, Nilo Paçanha, Taperoá, and Valença)
Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia (Dom Mecedo Costa, Muntz Ferreira, Nazaré, and Sao Felipe)
Diocese of Amargosa
15 December 2010Territory LostArchdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia (Camaçari, Candeias, Dias D’Ávila, Madre de Deus, São Francisco do Conde, São Sebastião do Passé, Simões Filho, and Terra Nova) Diocese of Camaçari (erected)
22 November 2017Territory LostArchdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia (Cruz das Almas, Cabaceiras do Paraguaçu, Cachoeira, Governador Mangabeira, Maragogipe, Muritiba, Santo Amaro, São Felix, Sapeaçu, and Saubara) Diocese of Cruz das Almas (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia
19501,134,4581,370,92782.8%901602504,537170540103ap1951
19661,710,2301,829,00093.5%751332088,22222265284ap1967
19701,175,0001,850,00063.5%841272115,568219866082ap1971
19761,612,9831,702,98394.7%841071918,4441021165574ap1977
19802,000,0002,100,00095.2%9710219910,0501416262577ap1981
19902,680,0003,180,00084.3%11110821912,2373016867698ap1991
19992,700,5003,180,50084.9%11712223911,29930200696107ap2000
20002,174,7783,185,59468.3%1171232409,06132188650108ap2001
20012,661,9983,327,49880.0%12911424310,95444249673110ap2002
20022,487,5583,370,67573.8%1291322619,53046251741109ap2003
20032,292,6943,373,09868.0%1371182558,99048209751109ap2004
20042,495,4393,544,65870.4%1421212639,48849222775109ap2005
20102,284,4773,210,87871.1%1441392838,07293273797105ap2011
20142,774,0003,284,00084.5%1611172789,97881230762110ap2015
20171,503,0893,214,22446.8%1471042515,98889151654100ap2018
20201,474,1003,151,90546.8%1531122655,562108190638101ap2021
20221,491,0003,187,66046.8%1481112595,756102196569101ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of São Salvador da Bahia de Todos os Santos
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 303
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 341
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 133
  • Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 341
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 364

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 13 Apr 2024