Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Rabat

Archidioecesis Rabatensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Cristóbal López Romero, S.D.B., Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Vincent Louis Marie Landel, S.C.I. di Béth., Archbishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Morocco
  • Square Kilometers: 400,000 (154,500 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceserabat.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 1 rue Hadj Mohammed Riffai, B.P. 258 R.P., 10001 Rabat, Maroc
  • Telephone: (0537)709.239
  • Fax: 706.282

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Rabat
2 July 1923ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Marocco o Marruecos Vicariate Apostolic of Rabat (erected)
5 July 1954Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
Diocese of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}
Vicariate Apostolic of Rabat
Prefecture Apostolic of Spanish Sahara and Ifni {Sahara Español e Ifni} (erected)
Archdiocese of Rabat
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Rabat Archdiocese of Rabat

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Rabat
1950360,0008,764,3004.1%601422021,78226548157ap1951
Archdiocese of Rabat
1970150,00012,430,0001.2%1038518879711241067ap1971
197860,00017,000,000.4%2954837226429850ap1981
199063,00027,000,000.2%1939581,0864818832ap1991
199922,00030,000,000.1%1334474684315440ap2000
200022,00030,000,000.1%1733504404316027ap2001
200122,00030,000,000.1%1733504404415527ap2002
200222,00027,300,000.1%2332554004315527ap2003
200321,00027,300,000.1%831395384414427ap2004
200421,00027,500,000.1%433375674514431ap2005
201025,00027,648,151.1%1219318062713528ap2011
201421,00028,860,000.1%2420444772512025ap2015
201720,00029,900,000.1%1419336062210128ap2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 15 Apr 2020

Quantcast