Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Congregation for Universal Inquisition | |||
21 July 1542 | Established | Congregation for Universal Inquisition | |
Congregation of the Holy Office | |||
1908 | Name Changed | Congregation for Universal Inquisition | Congregation of the Holy Office |
22 March 1917 | Territory Added | Congregation of the Index (suppressed) | Congregation of the Holy Office |
Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith | |||
7 December 1965 | Name Changed | Congregation of the Holy Office | Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith |
19 January 2019 | Territory Added | Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei” (suppressed) | Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith |
Dicastery for the Doctrine of the Faith | |||
5 June 2022 | Elevated | Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith | Dicastery for the Doctrine of the Faith |
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 27 Nov 2023 |
✠