Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)

Archidioecesis Tolosanus (-Convenarum-Rivensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Robert Jean Louis Le Gall, O.S.B., Archbishop
  • Emile Marcus, P.S.S., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 14 June 2006
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 6,372 (2,461 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Midi
  • Official Web Site: http://toulouse.catholique.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 7208, 24 rue Perchepinte, 31073 Toulouse CEDEX 07, France
  • Telephone: 5.61.14.82.70

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Toulouse
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Toulouse (erected)
11 July 1317Territory LostDiocese of Toulouse Diocese of Lavaur (erected)
11 July 1317Territory LostDiocese of Cahors
Diocese of Toulouse
Diocese of Montauban (erected)
11 July 1317Territory LostDiocese of Toulouse Diocese of Saint-Papoul (erected)
16 August 1317Territory LostDiocese of Toulouse Diocese of Lombez (erected)
Archdiocese of Toulouse
11 July 1317ElevatedDiocese of Toulouse Archdiocese of Toulouse
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges (suppressed) Diocese of Bayonne
Archdiocese of Toulouse
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (suppressed) Archdiocese of Toulouse
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Lectoure (suppressed) Diocese of Agen
Archdiocese of Toulouse
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Lombez (suppressed) Diocese of Bayonne
Archdiocese of Toulouse
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Mirepoix (suppressed) Diocese of Carcassonne
Archdiocese of Toulouse
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Montauban (suppressed) Archdiocese of Toulouse
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Pamiers (suppressed) Archdiocese of Toulouse
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Rieux (suppressed) Archdiocese of Toulouse
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Saint-Papoul (suppressed) Diocese of Carcassonne
Archdiocese of Toulouse
6 October 1822Territory LostArchdiocese of Toulouse Diocese of Montauban
6 October 1822Territory LostArchdiocese of Toulouse Diocese of Pamiers
Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne)
6 October 1822Name ChangedArchdiocese of Toulouse Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne)
Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)
19 January 1935Name ChangedArchdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne) Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)
Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)
14 June 2006Name ChangedArchdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux) Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)
1950451,200458,64798.4%4311605917631601,280575ap1951
1969600,000686,76087.4%4012386399384391,492192ap1971
1980688,000802,80085.7%3451705151,33523141,055628ap1981
1990771,703892,50386.5%2771384151,85911322832632ap1991
1999880,0001,029,00085.5%2381583962,22215341672633ap2000
2000880,0001,047,00084.0%2411413822,30317269680633ap2001
2001879,0001,047,00084.0%2281393672,39518311634633ap2002
2002866,6671,047,00082.8%2311353662,36717305509633ap2003
2003722,4301,047,00069.0%2331353681,96319267610633ap2004
2004722,4201,047,00069.0%2241333572,02318266507633ap2005
Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)
2006743,1601,126,00066.0%2231613841,93518281487629ap2007
2010763,0001,200,00063.6%2031023052,50123215424630ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014