Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis d’Anjou, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Toulouse, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1274²Born
19 May 129622.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 Dec 129622.9Ordained BishopBishop of Toulouse, France
19 Aug 129723.6DiedBishop of Toulouse, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis d’Anjou
Bishop Louis d’Anjou O.F.M. (born 1274, died ) Bishop of Toulouse

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 1.2 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 488
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast