Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrand de l’Isle Jourdain

Deceased

Bishop of Toulouse


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Oct 1270AppointedBishop of Toulouse, France
21 Dec 1270Ordained BishopBishop of Toulouse, France
3 Feb 1286DiedBishop of Toulouse, France

MicroData Summary for Bertrand de l’Isle Jourdain:
Bishop Bertrand de l’Isle Jourdain (died ) Bishop of Toulouse

  • a bishop for 15.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 488
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,089

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 4 Jan 2014