Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Louis Berton des Balbes de Crillon

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1684¹BornCavallicen
Apr 171329.2SelectedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
18 Sep 171329.7ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
15 Oct 171329.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
23 Aug 172743.6SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
22 Sep 172743.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
30 Aug 173955.6SelectedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
14 Dec 173955.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
5 Mar 175167.1DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis Berton des Balbes de Crillon:
Archbishop Jean-Louis Berton des Balbes de Crillon (born 1684, died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 319, and Page 378
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015