Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph de Montpezat de Carbon

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615BornSaint-Martory
20 Dec 166450.0SelectedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
28 Sep 166550.7ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
27 Dec 166551.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
21 Nov 167459.9SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
6 May 167560.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
17 Jun 168772.5DiedArchbishop of Toulouse, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph de Montpezat de Carbon:
Archbishop Joseph de Montpezat de Carbon (died ) Archbishop of Toulouse

  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013