Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie de Catelan

Deceased

Bishop of Rieux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1696BornTolosan
29 Oct 174751.8SelectedBishop of Rieux, France
29 Jan 174852.1ConfirmedBishop of Rieux, France
28 Apr 174852.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rieux, France
27 Mar 177175.2DiedBishop of Rieux, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie de Catelan:
Bishop Jean-Marie de Catelan (died ) Bishop of Rieux

  • a bishop for 22.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 358

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013