Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni de Fossé

Deceased

Bishop of Castres, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jan 1627AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Castres, France
27 Jan 1627AppointedTitular Bishop of Coronea
12 Mar 1628Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coronea
13 May 1632SucceededBishop of Castres, France
Sep 1654³DiedBishop of Castres, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de Fossé
Bishop Giovanni de Fossé (died Sep 1654) Bishop of Castres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToulouse

  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 165, and Page 140
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,628, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast