Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Hugues-Robert-Jean-Charles Cardinal de la Tour d’Auvergne-Lauraquais

Deceased

Bishop of Arras

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1768BornAuzeville-Tolosane
24 Jun 179223.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 180233.7SelectedBishop of Arras, France
6 May 180233.7ConfirmedBishop of Arras, France
16 May 180233.7Ordained BishopBishop of Arras, France
23 Dec 183971.3Elevated to Cardinal
16 Apr 184677.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
20 Jul 185182.9DiedBishop of Arras, France

MicroData Summary for Hugues-Robert-Jean-Charles de la Tour d’Auvergne-Lauraquais (VIAF: 106966416)
Hugues-Robert-Jean-Charles Cardinal de la Tour d’Auvergne-Lauraquais (born , died ) Bishop of Arras

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 49.1 years
  • a cardinal for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 93
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 22
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1839

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016