Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Louis Bertier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rieux


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1616AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rieux, France
19 Sep 1616AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
25 Jun 1617Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
25 Jun 1620SucceededBishop of Rieux, France
1657¹ResignedBishop of Rieux, France
8 Jun 1662DiedBishop Emeritus of Rieux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Louis Bertier:
Bishop Jean Louis Bertier (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rieux

  • a bishop for 44.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 296, and Page 200
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015