Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Auguste-Joseph-Louis Bardou, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbatore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1834BornRenneville, France
29 May 185824.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
1 May 187440.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Coimbatore, India
1 May 187440.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Telmissus
24 Aug 187440.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Telmissus
25 Nov 188652.6AppointedBishop of Coimbatore, India
7 Feb 190368.8DiedBishop of Coimbatore, India

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Auguste-Joseph-Louis Bardou:
Bishop Etienne-Auguste-Joseph-Louis Bardou M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Coimbatore

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 213, and Page 539

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013