Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-François Bertier

Deceased

Bishop of Rieux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1631¹BornToulouse
17 Apr 166231.2AppointedBishop of Rieux, France
25 Jun 166231.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rieux, France
29 Oct 170574.8DiedBishop of Rieux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine-François Bertier:
Bishop Antoine-François Bertier (died ) Bishop of Rieux

  • a bishop for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 1 Apr 2015