Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix)

Dioecesis Apamiensis (-Couseranensis-Mirapicensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Pamiers
16 September 1295ErectedDiocese of Pamiers (erected)
11 July 1317ErectedDiocese of Mirepoix (erected)
Diocese of Pamiers (erected)
11 July 1317Territory LostDiocese of Pamiers Diocese of Rieux (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Pamiers (suppressed) Archdiocese of Toulouse
Diocese of Pamiers
6 October 1822RestoredArchdiocese of Toulouse Diocese of Pamiers
Diocese of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix)
11 March 1910Name ChangedDiocese of Pamiers Diocese of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix)
1950141,160145,95696.7%20220269819343ap1951
1970130,000138,40093.9%14411458961118335ap1971
1980131,400139,50094.2%99101091,205110100303ap1981
1990130,000135,00096.3%838911,42831693304ap1991
1999100,000138,00072.5%644681,4706897313ap2000
2000100,000136,50073.3%603631,58764124313ap2001
2001100,000138,50072.2%572591,69462115313ap2002
200299,500137,20072.5%572591,68672111313ap2003
200399,500137,20072.5%583611,63173110313ap2004
200499,350138,50071.7%563591,68393103313ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 Aug 2014