Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vital de Castelmoron

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse


Events

DateEventTitle
5 May 1402Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
29 Jul 1409AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
1 Aug 1410DiedArchbishop of Toulouse, France

MicroData Summary for Vital de Castelmoron:
Archbishop Vital de Castelmoron (died ) Archbishop of Toulouse

  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,196
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 406, and Page 488

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013