Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Rodez (-Vabres)

Dioecesis Ruthenensis (-Vabrensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Rodez
5th CenturyErectedDiocese of Rodez (erected)
11 July 1317Territory LostDiocese of Rodez Diocese of Vabres (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Rodez (suppressed) Diocese of Cahors
Diocese of Saint-Flour
Diocese of Rodez
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Cahors Diocese of Rodez
Diocese of Rodez (-Vabres)
27 May 1875UnitedDiocese of Rodez Diocese of Rodez (-Vabres)
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Rodez (-Vabres) (from Albi)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Rodez (-Vabres)
1950285,000300,00095.0%90835943302502,980650ap1951
1969279,793281,56899.4%715367513721672,340357ap1971
1980279,000283,00098.6%588276154531121,810638ap1981
1990282,000290,00097.2%437164536224771,340539ap1991
1999262,000270,14197.0%307203278015581,078475ap2000
2000258,233263,80897.9%289193088385501,014475ap2001
2001256,974263,92497.4%277152928806451,021475ap2002
2002256,900263,92497.3%265142799206451,11336ap2003
2003255,700263,92496.9%2611427592983599836ap2004
2004255,400263,92496.8%25013263971104092236ap2005
2010260,000273,37795.1%183131961,326114176636ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 4 Jan 2014